Collection search - Bishop's Mills
-
Record information – Brief Bishop's Mills
Hierarchical level:ItemElectoral district:Grenville - DundasDate(s):Established Closing 1853-01-06 1970-08-01 Province:OntarioReference:RG3-D-3Type of material:Textual materialFound in:Archives / Post Offices and PostmastersItem ID number:8016 -
Record information – Details Additional information:Oxford Twp. - 1853-01-06Source:PSFDS03-(396)Postmasters names and service information Name of postmaster Military status Date of birth Date of appointment Date of vacancy Cause of vacancy H.A. Bishop 1853-01-06 Asa W. Bishop 1858-03-01 1878-03-22 Resignation Moses Waldron 1878-05-01 1879-08 Death G. Ferguson 1879-10-01 1905-05-23 * William James McLeod 1905-07-06 1911-11-18 Change of site George Ferguson 1911-11-28 1925-08-12 Death J.S. Ferguson 1926-02-08 1927-10-25 Resignation Harold London 1928-03-15 1929-01-28 Resignation William Andrew Nottell 1882-04 1929-06-29 1945-02-02 Death Miss Mildred Elizabeth Nottell * 1945-02-02 Acting Miss Mildred Elizabeth Nottell * 1945-06-25 1946-05-24 * Mrs. Mildred Elizabeth Adams(re-app) * 1946-07-03 1970-08-01 Closed Stephen L. Bishop PM 1855 1857-11-15 Resignation *In compliance with the Privacy Act (1983), certain personal information has been deleted from this file. -
Ordering and viewing options You can order materials in advance to be ready for you when you visit. You will need a user card to do this.
Cannot visit us on site? You can purchase a copy to be sent to you. Some restrictions may apply.