Collection search - Layco
-
Record information – Brief Layco
Hierarchical level:ItemElectoral district:MackenzieDate(s):Established Closing 1926-01-01 1958-06-30 Province:SaskatchewanReference:RG3-D-3Type of material:Textual materialFound in:Archives / Post Offices and PostmastersItem ID number:7333 -
Record information – Details Additional information:StoreStore owned by Postmaster - 1952-10-09SW Sec.6, Twp.32, R.10, W2Source:PSFDS03-(10285)Postmasters names and service information Name of postmaster Military status Date of birth Date of appointment Date of vacancy Cause of vacancy Martin Haug 1872-10 1926-01-01 1937-04-06 Resignation George Albert Duncan Littlewood 1900-10-05 1937-09-15 1941-05-12 Resignation Robert George Small OAS 1881-07-08 1941-08-20 1946-02-25 Resignation Mrs. Helen Irene Nelson * 1946-07-26 Acting Mrs. Helen Irene Nelson * 1946-08-07 1949-02-23 Resignation John Swiderski * 1949-05-01 Acting John Swiderski * 1949-07-18 1952-08-16 Resignation Clifford Henry Johnson OAS * 1952-10-09 Acting Clifford Henry Johnson OAS * 1952-11-29 1957-12-02 Resignation Mrs. Irene Eve Johnson * 1958-02-27 Acting *In compliance with the Privacy Act (1983), certain personal information has been deleted from this file. -
Ordering and viewing options You can order materials in advance to be ready for you when you visit. You will need a user card to do this.
Cannot visit us on site? You can purchase a copy to be sent to you. Some restrictions may apply.