Collection search - Côte St. Pierre
-
Record information – Brief Côte St. Pierre
Hierarchical level:ItemElectoral district:LabelleDate(s):Established Closing 1871-12-01 1887-12-24 Reopened Closing 1889-04-01 1941-12-31 Province:QuebecReference:RG3-D-3Type of material:Textual materialFound in:Archives / Post Offices and PostmastersItem ID number:6793 -
Record information – Details Additional information:Location - Suffolk - 1871-12-01Source:PSFDS03-(26088)Postmasters names and service information Name of postmaster Military status Date of birth Date of appointment Date of vacancy Cause of vacancy Joseph Leduc 1871-12-01 1882 Change in site J. Victor Gauthier 1882-07-12 1883-04-03 Resignation Emile Quesnel 1883-08-24 1887-12-22 Death, closed N. Fortier (reopened) 1889-04-01 1890-12-01 Resignation Benjamin Pilon 1896-06-02 1914-04-25 Resignation Losus Legault 1914-09-10 1918-03-08 Resignation Moise Malette 1918-04-18 1921-04-21 Resignation Mrs M.L. Blais 1921-09-03 1921-11-29 Resignation M. Malette 1922-06-30 1929-10-24 Resignation Dalmere Perrier 1930-01-04 1941-12-31 Closed, R.M.D., Ripon RR no.2 *In compliance with the Privacy Act (1983), certain personal information has been deleted from this file. -
Ordering and viewing options You can order materials in advance to be ready for you when you visit. You will need a user card to do this.
Cannot visit us on site? You can purchase a copy to be sent to you. Some restrictions may apply.