Collection search - Ottawa - Billings Bridge
-
Record information – Brief Ottawa - Billings Bridge
Hierarchical level:ItemElectoral district:RussellEstablished:1865-04-01Now known as:Ottawa Sub #77 since 1968-02-29Province:OntarioReference:RG3-D-3Type of material:Textual materialFound in:Archives / Post Offices and PostmastersItem ID number:6704 -
Record information – Details Additional information:9.00 - 1961-08-0127.00 - 1960-05-0130.00 - 1959-08-01$78.00 - 1959-02-011183 Cecil - memo - 1961-01-261581 Bank Street - 1959-10-011581 Bank Street - 1961-06-071591 Bank Street - 1958-07-14General Delivery Allowance:Gloucester - 1865-04-01Private BldgRented by PWDSemi - Staff - 1948-04-01Sub Office - 1958-07-12Source:PSFDS03-(3367)Postmasters names and service information Name of postmaster Military status Date of birth Date of appointment Date of vacancy Cause of vacancy William Smith 1865-04-01 1886-05-20 Resignation Mrs. Marilla Longley 1886-07-26 1900-08 Death Nelson Graburn 1903-09-28 1923-10-10 Resignation George M. Dowler O.A.S. 1924-02-29 1927-12-06 * Hector Doresa O.A.S. 1881-04 1929-04-15 1938-08-08 Resignation Hyacinthe Jodoin O.A.S. 1897-03-09 1938-09-02 1948-08-03 Resignation Charles Henry Brown O.A.S. 1899-12-01 1948-11-09 Acting Charles Henry Brown O.A.S. 1899-12-01 1949-11-09 1952-01-23 * W.W. Thibeault 1952-01-27 Acting Clerk from Ottawa P.O. F.J. Crawford O.A.S. * 1952-04-21 1958-07-12 Office made a Sub - Transferred to Ottawa PO Peter Softy * 1958-07-14 Acting Peter Softy * 1959-05-14 1959-08-31 Resignation Emmett Joseph Noel * 1959-10-01 1960-01-18 Resignation Edward Casper Paiement 1900-05-26 1960-04-01 *In compliance with the Privacy Act (1983), certain personal information has been deleted from this file. -
Ordering and viewing options You can order materials in advance to be ready for you when you visit. You will need a user card to do this.
Cannot visit us on site? You can purchase a copy to be sent to you. Some restrictions may apply.