Collection search - Gormley
-
Record information – Brief Gormley
Hierarchical level:ItemElectoral district:York NorthEstablished:1851-06-06Province:OntarioReference:RG3-D-3Type of material:Textual materialFound in:Archives / Post Offices and PostmastersItem ID number:5902 -
Record information – Details Additional information:MarkhamSource:PSFDS03-(6806)Postmasters names and service information Name of postmaster Military status Date of birth Date of appointment Date of vacancy Cause of vacancy James Gormley 1851-06-06 1876-11-16 Resignation Richard Lewis 1877-01-01 1883-02 Resignation Colin McKenzie 1883-04-01 1904-01-25 Resignation Robert Johnson 1904-03-01 1910-11-02 Resignation C.H. Keys 1910-11-30 1915-09-15 Resignation John W. Wilson 1915-09-15 1918-08-24 Resignation Ellis J. Webb 1918-12-15 1923-02-27 Resignation Samuel N. Doner 1923-04-25 1954-02-15 Resignation Charles F. Milsted * 1954-04-01 Acting Charles F. Milsted * 1954-07-08 1964-12-24 Death Mrs. Evelyn Margaret Milsted * 1961-12-08 Acting Mrs. Evelyn Margarer Milsted * 1965-02-23 Mrs. R. Milne 1973-11-14 Larry M. Ross * 1973-12-19 P. Koropatwa 1974-07-02 1974-10-07 Acting Mrs. J. Ewen 1974-10-07 1974-12-02 Acting P. Koropatwa 1974-12-02 Acting *In compliance with the Privacy Act (1983), certain personal information has been deleted from this file. -
Ordering and viewing options You can order materials in advance to be ready for you when you visit. You will need a user card to do this.
Cannot visit us on site? You can purchase a copy to be sent to you. Some restrictions may apply.