Collection search - Hartley
-
Record information – Brief Hartley
Hierarchical level:ItemElectoral district:Victoria - HaliburtonDate(s):Established Closing 1868-07-01 1980-09-26 Province:OntarioReference:RG3-D-3Type of material:Textual materialFound in:Archives / Post Offices and PostmastersItem ID number:5847 -
Record information – Details Additional information:Eldon - 1868-07-01Source:PSFDS03-(11569)Postmasters names and service information Name of postmaster Military status Date of birth Date of appointment Date of vacancy Cause of vacancy Archibald Campbell 1868-07-01 1874-09-18 Resignation James Barker 1875-01-01 1881-04-14 Resignation John Barker 1882-10-01 1922-04-04 Resignation Robert Spence 1922-05-08 1948-07-26 Resignation Clifford Gerald Irwin * 1948-09-03 Acting Clifford Gerald Irwin * 1948-12-14 1961-10-16 Resignation Mrs. Barbara B. Clarke * 1961-11-01 Acting Mrs. Barbara B. Clarke * 1962-02-02 1966-09-14 Resignation Joseph Omer Taugas * 1966-09-19 Acting Joseph Omer Taugas * 1966-12-01 1967-06-09 Resignation James J. Norton * 1967-07-14 Acting James J. Norton * 1968-07-15 1971-11-21 Retirement Mrs. Ivy Norton * 1971-11-22 1973-08-01 Retirement Margaret McSweeney * 1973-08-01 1980-09-26 Office Closed *In compliance with the Privacy Act (1983), certain personal information has been deleted from this file. -
Ordering and viewing options You can order materials in advance to be ready for you when you visit. You will need a user card to do this.
Cannot visit us on site? You can purchase a copy to be sent to you. Some restrictions may apply.