Collection search - Balmoral
-
Record information – Brief Balmoral
Hierarchical level:ItemElectoral district:HaldimandDate(s):Established Closing 1851-07-06 1922-01-31 Province:OntarioReference:RG3-D-3Type of material:Textual materialFound in:Archives / Post Offices and PostmastersItem ID number:5828 -
Record information – Details Additional information:Walpole - 1851-07-06Source:PSFDS03-(224)Postmasters names and service information Name of postmaster Military status Date of birth Date of appointment Date of vacancy Cause of vacancy John Heasman 1851-07-06 1855-10-03 Resignation Lewis Anguish 1856-01-14 1865-05-31 Resignation William Lamb Jr. 1865-07-01 1868-05-08 Resignation George B. Lundy 1868-07-01 1878-11-14 Resignation E.G. Cole 1878-07-01 1879 Left the place Donald Campbell 1880-01-01 1881-07-11 Resignation P. Finch Jr. 1883-04-01 1885-09-24 Resignation Nile P. Finch 1886-01-01 1887-12-02 Resignation Peter Heldt 1888-04-01 1891-06-12 Resignation David Rutherford 1891-08-01 1894-07-12 Resignation Mrs. Catherine Held 1895-02-01 1901-01-22 Resignation Robert McDonald 1901-04-22 1902-11-01 Resignation B.H. Webber 1901-12-01 1922-01-31 Closed (R.M.D.) *In compliance with the Privacy Act (1983), certain personal information has been deleted from this file. -
Ordering and viewing options You can order materials in advance to be ready for you when you visit. You will need a user card to do this.
Cannot visit us on site? You can purchase a copy to be sent to you. Some restrictions may apply.