Collection search - Sparta
-
Record information – Brief Sparta
Hierarchical level:ItemElectoral district:ElginEstablished:1841-07-06Province:OntarioReference:RG3-D-3Type of material:Textual materialFound in:Archives / Post Offices and PostmastersItem ID number:4760 -
Record information – Details Additional information:Group 5 - 1978-03-01RevenueStoreYarmouth - 1841-07-06Source:PSFDS03-(6543)Postmasters names and service information Name of postmaster Military status Date of birth Date of appointment Date of vacancy Cause of vacancy Duncan Wilson 1841-07-06 E.O. Easkins 1901-02-01 1922-12-19 Death Eric O. Oille 1868-04 1923-03-26 1950-03-12 Death Norman Howard Oille * 1950-03-23 Acting Norman Howard Oille * 1950-04-15 1976-07-23 Retirement Michael P. Roberts 1976-07-24 1977-04-01 C.A. Helmer 1977-04-02 1977-06-08 Acting C.A. Helmer 1977-06-08 John A. Eakins PM in 1853 1900-12-18 Resignation *In compliance with the Privacy Act (1983), certain personal information has been deleted from this file. -
Ordering and viewing options You can order materials in advance to be ready for you when you visit. You will need a user card to do this.
Cannot visit us on site? You can purchase a copy to be sent to you. Some restrictions may apply.