Collection search - Poplar Point
-
Record information – Brief Poplar Point
Hierarchical level:ItemElectoral district:Sellirk InterlakeEstablished:1871-07-01Province:ManitobaReference:RG3-D-3Type of material:Textual materialFound in:Archives / Post Offices and PostmastersItem ID number:4663 -
Record information – Details Additional information:GRP 03 1967-10-01GRP 03 1980-09-01GRP 06 1972-04-01GRP 07 1968-09-01GRP 15 1950-12-01GRP 16 1951-04-01GRP 16 1951-12-01GRP 17 1953-04-01GRP 17 1953-12-01GRP 17 1965-04-01GRP 19 1955-03-18GRP 19 1956-04-01GRP 19 1957-05-01GRP 19 1960-08-01High Bluff - 8 milesLot 78, Twp. 12, R. 4, W1Poplar Point - 1871-07-01Reaburn - 5 milesSource:PSFDS03-(8653)Postmasters names and service information Name of postmaster Military status Date of birth Date of appointment Date of vacancy Cause of vacancy Vacancy cancelled 1945-02-23 Resignation David Tait 1871-07-01 1873 Thomas A. Newman 1879-10-01 1883-06-02 Left the place Hugh Armstrong 1884-10-01 1886-10-04 Resignation George M. Jackson 1887-01-01 1899-06-29 * Adam G. Cunningham 1899-08-01 1901-01-31 M. H. Ritchie 1901-04-01 1907-06-01 Resignation William Lang 1869-08 1907-07-26 Frederick John Webster OAS 1896-03-29 1945-04-01 1961-03-28 Retirement Thomas Murray OAS * 1961-03-29 1961-04-06 Resignation Wesley L. Gowler OAS * 1961-04-29 Acting Wesley L. Gowler OAS * 1961-05-18 1973-07-09 Resignation Mrs. Wendy C. La Freniere * 1973-07-10 1979-11-30 Resignation Mrs. Margart J. Turner * 1979-12-03 *In compliance with the Privacy Act (1983), certain personal information has been deleted from this file. -
Ordering and viewing options You can order materials in advance to be ready for you when you visit. You will need a user card to do this.
Cannot visit us on site? You can purchase a copy to be sent to you. Some restrictions may apply.