Collection search - Beloeil
-
Record information – Brief Beloeil
Hierarchical level:ItemElectoral district:ChamblyDate(s):Established Closing 1851-08-06 Reopened Closing Prior to 1832 1849-07-06 Now known as:Beloeil Village since 1861-04-01Province:QuebecReference:RG3-D-3Type of material:Textual materialFound in:Archives / Post Offices and PostmastersItem ID number:4180 -
Record information – Details Additional information:P.O. res 288Source:PSFDS03-(24529)Postmasters names and service information Name of postmaster Military status Date of birth Date of appointment Date of vacancy Cause of vacancy J.E.A. Therrien H. De Rouville (Shown as PM in 1832) 1843-04-06 Pierre L. Letourneux 1843-04-07 1849-07-06 Closed Prudent Malo 1851-08-06 1855-01-07 Resignation Joseph R. Brillon 1855-04-01 Mr Louis Comtois 1903-12-01 1909 Death Mrs L. Comtois 1909-01-30 1938-11-09 Death Miss Henriette Comtois 1895-06-01 1938-11-09 Acting Miss Henriette Comtois 1895-05-01 1938-12-07 1960-05-09 Retirement Miss Irene Jeannotte * 1960-05-10 Acting J. Fernand Champoux * 1968-03-30 1975 Retraite M. Bernard Fleurant 1975-06 *In compliance with the Privacy Act (1983), certain personal information has been deleted from this file. -
Ordering and viewing options You can order materials in advance to be ready for you when you visit. You will need a user card to do this.
Cannot visit us on site? You can purchase a copy to be sent to you. Some restrictions may apply.