Collection search - Farguhar
-
Record information – Brief Farguhar
Hierarchical level:ItemElectoral district:HuronDate(s):Established Closing 1857-06-01 1913-12-01 Province:OntarioReference:RG3-D-3Type of material:Textual materialFound in:Archives / Post Offices and PostmastersItem ID number:4133 -
Record information – Details Additional information:Usborne Twp - 1857-06-01Source:PSFDS03-(1462)Postmasters names and service information Name of postmaster Military status Date of birth Date of appointment Date of vacancy Cause of vacancy William Edmond 1857-06-01 1869-09-11 Resignation Robert Monteith 1870-01-01 1873-09-03 Resignation N.J. Clark 1873-10-01 1884-02-15 Resignation Robert Gardner 1885-01-01 1888-01-03 Resignation John Kay 1888-01-01 1899-02-09 Resignation Duncan Kay 1899-03-01 1900-04-07 Resignation B.W.F. Beavers 1900-09-01 1909-02-19 Resignation Joshua Johns 1909-03-19 1909-09-21 Resignation John Campbell 1909-10-12 1911-10-12 Resignation Samuel G. Lamport 1911-11-13 1913-12-01 Closed R.M.D. *In compliance with the Privacy Act (1983), certain personal information has been deleted from this file. -
Ordering and viewing options You can order materials in advance to be ready for you when you visit. You will need a user card to do this.
Cannot visit us on site? You can purchase a copy to be sent to you. Some restrictions may apply.