Collection search - Vancouver-Sub no. 89
-
Record information – Brief Vancouver-Sub no. 89
Hierarchical level:ItemElectoral district:Burnaby RichmondDate(s):Established Closing 1908-08-01 1955-10-03 Reopened Closing 1955-12-05 1956-06-02 Province:British ColumbiaReference:RG3-D-3Type of material:Textual materialFound in:Archives / Post Offices and PostmastersItem ID number:4051 -
Record information – Details Additional information:Grocery storeLocation - 2960 SE Marine Drive, South Burnaby - 1951-11-01, 1952-11-01Location - 3000 Marine Dr., South BurnabyLocation - Gilley Ave. and Marine DriveLocation - Gilley Ave. and River Rd.Status - Sub office - 1946-12-01Source:PSFDS03-(24241)Postmasters names and service information Name of postmaster Military status Date of birth Date of appointment Date of vacancy Cause of vacancy J. A. Skinner 1908-08-01 1921-03-11 Resignation Mrs. Eliza M. Jeffries 1921-10-16 1926-05-10 Resignation Wm. Cyril Swires OAS 1926-08-23 1927-11-21 Resignation Chas. Pendock OAS 1928-01-24 1928-08-04 Resignation Walter Burton 1928-10-03 1929-10-30 Resignation Harold Alex. Devine 1929-12-11 1931-01-30 Resignation Geo. Alexander Rae 1887-10-27 1931-03-02 1931-10-28 Resignation Chas. Montague Smith OAS 1895-05-04 1932-01-29 1934-11-30 Resignation George Greenslade OAS 1868-03-08 1935-03-08 1937-07-14 Resignation Harold Ambrose Young 1884-01-20 1937-07-31 Acting Harold Ambrose Young 1884-01-20 1937-10-26 1944-03-20 Resignation Arthur Binns OAS 1896-07-20 1944-04-01 Acting Arthur Binns OAS 1896-07-20 1944-04-25 1945-09-29 Resignation Floyd Lewis Cooper OAS * 1945-11-01 Acting Ferguson Martin Stratton * 1946-01-01 Acting Ferguson Martin Stratton * 1946-12-01 1947-05-28 Resignation James Walsh 1874-12-20 1947-06-04 Acting Robert Prange * 1947-10-31 Acting Robert Prange * 1947-12-05 1948-07-21 Resignation Norris Donald Cronk * 1948-07-26 Acting Norris Donald Cronk * 1948-09-22 1950-10-02 Resignation John Arthur Batchelor * 1950-10-02 Acting John Arthur Batchelor * 1951-02-27 1951-10-02 Resignation Alexander Daniel Snider * 1951-10-16 Acting Mrs. Mary Viola Greenwood * 1951-11-01 Acting Mrs. Mary Viola Greenwood * 1951-11-27 1952-11-01 Resignation Norman Bernard Wallace 1885-05-26 1952-11-01 Acting Norman Bernard Wallace 1885-05-26 1953-02-03 1954-07-02 Resignation Mrs. Elizabeth Grace Day OAS * 1954-07-02 Acting Mrs. Elizabeth Grace Day OAS * 1954-10-19 1956-06-02 * Closed *In compliance with the Privacy Act (1983), certain personal information has been deleted from this file. -
Ordering and viewing options You can order materials in advance to be ready for you when you visit. You will need a user card to do this.
Cannot visit us on site? You can purchase a copy to be sent to you. Some restrictions may apply.