Collection search - Laval-des-Rapides Sub no. 4
-
Record information – Brief Laval-des-Rapides Sub no. 4
Hierarchical level:ItemElectoral district:LavalEstablished:Prior to 1843-07-06Now known as:Ville de Laval Sub no. 4 since 1966-06-06Province:QuebecReference:RG3-D-3Type of material:Textual materialFound in:Archives / Post Offices and PostmastersItem ID number:3857 -
Record information – Details Additional information:Location - 1540 Labelle Blvd. - 1957-02-06Location - 1555 Principale, St. Martin - 1956-09-11Location - Ile JesusStatus - Sub office - 1956-09-11Source:PSFDS03-(26213)Postmasters names and service information Name of postmaster Military status Date of birth Date of appointment Date of vacancy Cause of vacancy Charles Smallwood (shown as PM in 1853) 1862-12-09 Change in site, non-resident Louis Lavoie 1863-10-01 1869-08-08 Resignation Dr. J. C. Poitevin 1869-10-01 1870-01-13 Resignation Leon Sauriol 1870-02-01 1875-11-18 Resignation Louis Lavoie 1876-01-01 1880 * Miss Celine Lavoie 1880-10-01 1881-11-08 Resignation Dr. R. J. Charette 1882-01-01 1889-08 Removed from place U. B. Desrochers 1893-04-01 1904-07-20 Death Mrs. U. B. Desrochers 1904-10-01 1909-04-02 Resignation Louis Lavoie 1909-04-16 1914-02-26 * Pierre Celestin Gratton 1914-03-26 1919-07-31 Resignation A. Belanger 1919-09-16 1930-01-14 Death Mrs. Azilda Belanger 1930-01-31 1930-02-25 Resignation Nephtalie Lavoie 1930-04-08 1930-11-20 Resignation Mrs. Leoncia Berthelette Gravel 1931-02-05 1935-08 Death Miss Rosa Gravel 1935-09-05 Acting Miss Rosa Gravel 1935-09-18 1956-03-31 Resignation Miss Laurette Cleroux * 1956-09-18 1956-11-02 Resignation Claude Martineau * 1957-03-06 *In compliance with the Privacy Act (1983), certain personal information has been deleted from this file. -
Ordering and viewing options You can order materials in advance to be ready for you when you visit. You will need a user card to do this.
Cannot visit us on site? You can purchase a copy to be sent to you. Some restrictions may apply.