Collection search - Negginan
-
Record information – Brief Negginan
Hierarchical level:ItemElectoral district:ProvencherDate(s):Established Closing 1954-01-19 1957-03-27 Reopened Closing 1957-09-23 1958-04-03 1958-09-08 1976-02-10 1976-07-16 Province:ManitobaReference:RG3-D-3Type of material:Textual materialFound in:Archives / Post Offices and PostmastersItem ID number:3847 -
Record information – Details Additional information:Accounting 1968-07-01GRP 01 1954-01-19GRP 01 1957-09-23GRP 01 1958-09-08GRP 01 1960-08-01GRP 02 1954-10-01GRP 02 1956-04-01GRP 02 1965-09-01GRP 03 1973-10-01GRP 04 1973-05-01GRP 04 1973-09-01Previous Office No. 86643Source:PSFDS03-(8171)Postmasters names and service information Name of postmaster Military status Date of birth Date of appointment Date of vacancy Cause of vacancy Rev. Guy Burlot * 1954-01-19 1960-01-09 Resignation Leonard Dueck * 1960-01-10 Acting Temp. closed 1960-02-01 Leonard Dueck * 1960-02-16 Acting Leonard Dueck * 1960-03-23 1961-06-26 Resignation Norman Graham Simpson * 1961-07-01 Acting Norman Graham Simpson * 1961-09-28 1968-03-01 Change in P.M. only Wulfert A. Tolboom 1968-03-01 1972-01-01 E. P. Lacroix HBC 1972-01-01 1975-02-02 HBC resigned Poplar River Band 1975-02-02 1976-02-10 Closed Poplar River Band 1976-07-16 1979-06-28 Jack Clarksen * 1979-08-10 1979-12-19 The Bay 1979-12-20 *In compliance with the Privacy Act (1983), certain personal information has been deleted from this file. -
Ordering and viewing options You can order materials in advance to be ready for you when you visit. You will need a user card to do this.
Cannot visit us on site? You can purchase a copy to be sent to you. Some restrictions may apply.