Collection search - Edmonton Sub. No. 17
-
Record information – Brief Edmonton Sub. No. 17
Hierarchical level:ItemElectoral district:East Edmonton, West EdmontonDate(s):Established Closing 1926-03-12 1955-12-29 Reopened Closing 1956-03-10 1959-04-13 1960-08-04 Province:AlbertaReference:RG3-D-3Type of material:Textual materialFound in:Archives / Post Offices and PostmastersItem ID number:3802 -
Record information – Details Additional information:8714-91st Street8801-91st Street8812-92nd Street - 1951-10-018816-92nd Street - 1954-09-20, 1956-03-10Bonnie Doon Zellers Western Ltd. - 1960-08-04Mail route - Letter CarrierStore - Flower shopStore rented by PM - 1954-08-09Source:PSFDS03-(12858)Postmasters names and service information Name of postmaster Military status Date of birth Date of appointment Date of vacancy Cause of vacancy John Geo. Hastings 1926-03-12 1937-09-29 Resignation Wm. Donald Morrison 1891-08-12 1937-10-01 Acting Wm. Donald Morrison 1891-08-12 1937-10-23 1941-01-02 Resignation Percy Newton Gray 1891-11-23 1941-01-03 Acting Percy Newton Gray 1891-11-23 1941-02-08 1944-03-06 Resignation Dalton John Chute * 1944-03-09 Acting Dalton John Chute * 1944-04-20 1945-07 Resignation Ernest Raymond MacDonald 1895-05-30 1945-07-13 Acting Ernest Raymond MacDonald 1895-05-30 1946-03-12 1947-01-03 Resignation Harry Simonovich * 1947-01-04 Acting Omer Joseph Gauvreau OAS * 1947-02-19 Acting Omer Joseph Gauvreau OAS * 1947-04-25 1947-09-29 Resignation Gwylim Trevor Grove * 1947-09-29 Acting Jesse Oscar Anderson 1886-02-04 1947-12-10 Acting Jesse Oscar Anderson 1886-02-04 1948-04-23 1948-06-14 Resignation Steven Thomas Elaschuk OAS * 1948-06-14 Acting Steven Thomas Elaschuk OAS * 1949-02-16 1949-10-29 Resignation Mrs. Mary Sharun * 1949-11-01 Acting Mrs. Alma A. Quick * 1951-10-01 Acting Mrs. Alma A. Quick * 1951-12-18 1954-07-31 Resignation Mrs. Beatrice Louise Pauline Turninga 1900-06-15 1954-08-09 Acting Mrs. Alma Alice Quick * 1954-09-20 1955-12-09 Resignation Mrs. Rena Marjory Thomson (re-opened) 1956-03-10 1958-01-04 Harold Seidner * 1958-01-02 Acting Mrs. Ethel Oweta Peterson * 1958-07-11 Acting Mrs. Ethel Oweta Peterson * 1958-08-28 1959-04-13 Resignation Mrs. Grace C. Tillapaugh (re-opened) * 1960-08-04 1962-11-31 Albert Victor Rowland * 1962-12-01 *In compliance with the Privacy Act (1983), certain personal information has been deleted from this file. -
Ordering and viewing options You can order materials in advance to be ready for you when you visit. You will need a user card to do this.
Cannot visit us on site? You can purchase a copy to be sent to you. Some restrictions may apply.