Collection search - Clarence Creek
-
Record information – Brief Clarence Creek
Hierarchical level:ItemElectoral district:RussellEstablished:1867-03-01Province:OntarioReference:RG3-D-3Type of material:Textual materialFound in:Archives / Post Offices and PostmastersItem ID number:3791 -
Record information – Details Additional information:Civil Service Commission 1961-01-01Clarence - 1867-03-01PO 2760-1Source:PSFDS03-(11501)Postmasters names and service information Name of postmaster Military status Date of birth Date of appointment Date of vacancy Cause of vacancy Firmin Neaubert 1867-03-01 1868-12-28 Resignation S. G. A. Raiche 1869-02-01 1874 * Joseph Menard 1874-10-01 1875-09-28 Resignation Francis Menard 1875-10-01 1878-07 Resignation Telesphore Perrin 1879-01-01 1911-12-21 Resignation W. Thivierge 1912-02-09 1922 * Jules Boileau 1922 Acting Oscar Joly OAS 1926-07-30 1927-05-09 * Godfrois W. Fortier 1927-10-08 1933-11-28 Dismissal, Political Partisanship Oscar Joly OAS 1933-12-26 1936-06-19 Change in Site Amedee Fortier * 1936-06-20 Acting Amedee Fortier * 1936-11-16 1969-06-05 Death Gillis Fortier * 1969-05-05 1969-06-26 Temporary Assignment Mrs. Donna Fortier * 1969-06-27 1970-10-05 Resignation Mrs. Marie Parent * 1970-10-06 1980-10-20 Transferred to Navan Madeleine Major * 1980-10-20 *In compliance with the Privacy Act (1983), certain personal information has been deleted from this file. -
Ordering and viewing options You can order materials in advance to be ready for you when you visit. You will need a user card to do this.
Cannot visit us on site? You can purchase a copy to be sent to you. Some restrictions may apply.