Collection search - Spirit River
-
Record information – Brief Spirit River
Hierarchical level:ItemElectoral district:Peace River, West EdmontonEstablished:1916-07-20Province:AlbertaReference:RG3-D-3Type of material:Textual materialFound in:Archives / Post Offices and PostmastersItem ID number:3752 -
Record information – Details Additional information:Group 33 - 1957-04-01Lot 5, Blk. 3, NE Sec. 22, Twp. 78, R. 6, W6M - 1938-08-01Lot 8, Blk. 3, NE Sec. 22, Twp. 78, R. 6, W6M - 1926-04-07Mail route - Spirit River-Railway StationPO 1888-1Private BuildingSec. 22, Twp. 78, R. 6, W6M - 1916-07-20Semi-Staff Gr. 32 - 1948-04-01Source:PSFDS03-(14269)Postmasters names and service information Name of postmaster Military status Date of birth Date of appointment Date of vacancy Cause of vacancy Angus P. Campbell 1916-07-20 1916-09-04 Resignation C.E. Knowles 1916-11-30 1917-01-31 Resignation Mrs. R.A. Correll 1917-04-19 1917-10-11 Resignation John Manners Fildes 1880-04 1918-07-11 1950-02-27 Retirement Mrs. Mary Southgate Wright 1895-05-04 1950-02-28 Acting Arthur James Sands OAS * 1950-11-17 Acting Mrs. Mary Southgate Wright 1895-05-04 1951-09-08 Acting Cyril Gladwin Harrington * 1952-01-09 Acting Mrs. Mary Southgate Wright 1895-05-04 1952-08-09 Acting Douglas Alexander Blackie * 1954-02-23 Acting Douglas Alexander Blackie * 1955-05-01 1969-11-01 E.Z. Grimm 1969-11-01 1972-04-08 Resigned Mrs. N.M. Alfred 1972-04-18 1972-07-05 Acting D.M. Trahan * 1972-07-06 1975-06-04 Trans. to Hay River Mrs. N.M. Alfred * 1975-09-08 *In compliance with the Privacy Act (1983), certain personal information has been deleted from this file. -
Ordering and viewing options You can order materials in advance to be ready for you when you visit. You will need a user card to do this.
Cannot visit us on site? You can purchase a copy to be sent to you. Some restrictions may apply.