Collection search - Dauphin
-
Record information – Brief Dauphin
Hierarchical level:ItemElectoral district:DauphinEstablished:1897-04-01Province:ManitobaReference:RG3-D-3Type of material:Textual materialFound in:Archives / Post Offices and PostmastersItem ID number:3528 -
Record information – Details Additional information:Government BuildingOchre River - 7 1/2 milesSec. 10, Twp. 25, R. 19, W1 - 1897-04-01Semi-staff (Grade 2-B) - 1943-03-01Staff OfficeStaff P.O. (Grade 9) - 1948-04-01Valley River - 8 1/2 milesSource:PSFDS03-(7417)Postmasters names and service information Name of postmaster Military status Date of birth Date of appointment Date of vacancy Cause of vacancy Thomas Iredale 1897-04-01 1907-04-01 Resignation Albert E. Iredale 1868-09-07 1907-05-01 1942-03-18 Harold Atkin 1879-10-08 1942-06-18 1943-02-28 Acting David Justice OAS 1885-10-08 1943-03-01 1949-10-05 Retirement James A. Cressey * 1949-10-06 1951-09-12 Mrs. Theresa Gertrude Williams 1901-03-17 1951-09-13 1951-09-18 Acting J.R. Newell * 1951-09-19 1952-03-10 Acting James Llewellyn Thornton Simmons * 1952-03-11 1955-04-06 Transferred to Brandon P.O. Mrs. Theresa Gertrude Williams 1901-03-17 1955-04-07 1955-05-12 Acting William John Quick * 1955-05-13 (Still there July 1964) Joseph Saboraki * 1956-05-21 1984-12-28 A.L. Hallgrimson 1984-12-31 1986-02-28 Transferred to Winnipeg Curt Pederson 1986-03-01 *In compliance with the Privacy Act (1983), certain personal information has been deleted from this file. -
Ordering and viewing options You can order materials in advance to be ready for you when you visit. You will need a user card to do this.
Cannot visit us on site? You can purchase a copy to be sent to you. Some restrictions may apply.