Collection search - Hamilton - Homeside Sub
-
Record information – Brief Hamilton - Homeside Sub
Hierarchical level:ItemElectoral district:Hamilton EastDate(s):Established Closing 1912-07-15 1977-01-28 Province:OntarioReference:RG3-D-3Type of material:Textual materialFound in:Archives / Post Offices and PostmastersItem ID number:3332 -
Record information – Details Additional information:6.00 - 1964-05-0112.00 - 1963-05-0118.00 - 1962-05-0130.00 - 1961-05-01105.00 - 1957-05-01126.00 - 1960-05-01129.00 - 1958-04-01129.00 - 1959-04-01225.00 - 1956-05-01750.00 - 1955-05-01925.00 - 1954-05-011238.00 - 1953-07-01$1250.00 - 1951-04-011324 Barton St., E. - 1950-06-15140 Kenilworth Ave. - 1919-09-19216 Kenilworth Ave., N.237 Kenilworth Ave., N. - 1942-04-23246 Kenilworth Ave., N.274 Kenilworth Ave., N.Barton - 1912-07-15From Regular to Sub Office - 1917-10-01General Delivery Allowance:StoreSource:PSFDS03-(5799)Postmasters names and service information Name of postmaster Military status Date of birth Date of appointment Date of vacancy Cause of vacancy P.W. Tice 1912-07-15 1913-05-29 Resignation Charles H. Hughes 1914-03-11 1916 Resignation W.C. Whorly 1916-04-17 1916-07-25 Resignation A.R. Young 1916-10-23 1919-03-07 Resignation George Dibden 1919-04-03 1919-06-14 Resignation Louis Cheason O.A.S. 1919-09-19 1927-06-16 Resignation Archibald Lewis Lord 1883-03-03 1927-07-04 1934-06-02 Resignation William Jennings Best 1894-02-03 1934-07-30 1942-02-22 Resignation George William Chappell * 1942-04-23 1950-05-25 * Ackroyd Leach O.A.S. * 1950-05-04 Acting Ackroyd Leach O.A.S. * 1950-06-15 1950-12-14 * William Leach 1887-08-15 1950-12-02 Acting William Leach 1887-08-15 1951-03-27 1955-03-31 Resignation William Charles Chapman O.A.S. 1900-09-04 1955-04-16 Acting William Charles Chapman O.A.S. 1900-09-04 1955-04-25 1958-01-27 Resignation John Lambert O.A.S. * 1958-01-31 Acting PMG John Lambert O.A.S. * 1958-04-15 1961-06-27 Resignation Mrs. Beatrice M. Strapps * 1961-07-16 Acting Mrs. Beatrice M. Strapps * 1961-09-19 1962-11-16 Resignation Michael Lazoryk * 1962-12-03 Acting Michael Lazoryk * 1962-12-17 1966-10-11 Resignation Walter Mikitson * 1966-10-17 Acting Walter Mikitson * 1966-12-12 1972-09-30 Resignation Robert Lang 1973-01-16 1977-01-28 Resignation *In compliance with the Privacy Act (1983), certain personal information has been deleted from this file. -
Ordering and viewing options You can order materials in advance to be ready for you when you visit. You will need a user card to do this.
Cannot visit us on site? You can purchase a copy to be sent to you. Some restrictions may apply.