Collection search - Cap St. Martin
-
Record information – Brief Cap St. Martin
Hierarchical level:ItemElectoral district:LavalEstablished:1897-04-01Now known as:Laval des Rapides Sub no.19 since 1961-12-11Province:QuebecReference:RG3-D-3Type of material:Textual materialFound in:Archives / Post Offices and PostmastersItem ID number:29394 -
Record information – Details Additional information:Location - St. MartinSource:PSFDS03-(25309)Postmasters names and service information Name of postmaster Military status Date of birth Date of appointment Date of vacancy Cause of vacancy Moise Gobeil 1897-04-01 1907-09 Resignation Paschal Dumoulin 1907-10-10 1931-04-13 Political partisanship, order in Council Napoleon Lalonde 1931-04-24 1936-01-09 Dismissal, political partisanship Napoleon Ouimet 1881-08-10 1936-02-12 1944-04-20 Resignation Andre Lamarche * 1944-06-14 Andre Lamarche * 1944-07-19 1945-03-19 Resignation Miss Madeleine Lalonde * 1945-06-19 1949-03-02 Resignation Mrs Corinne Marien 1895-09-21 1949-05-17 1954-06-17 Death Mr Rene St Pierre * 1954-06-18 Acting Mr Rene St Pierre * 1954-08-31 1959-10-23 Resignation Mme Simone St Pierre * 1957-10-28 Acting Mrs Simone St Pierre * 1959-01-26 *In compliance with the Privacy Act (1983), certain personal information has been deleted from this file. -
Ordering and viewing options You can order materials in advance to be ready for you when you visit. You will need a user card to do this.
Cannot visit us on site? You can purchase a copy to be sent to you. Some restrictions may apply.