Collection search - Revelstoke
-
Record information – Brief Revelstoke
Hierarchical level:ItemElectoral district:Okanagan - RevelstokeEstablished:1886-02-01Province:British ColumbiaReference:RG3-D-3Type of material:Textual materialFound in:Archives / Post Offices and PostmastersItem ID number:28085 -
Record information – Details Source:PSFDS03-(22989)Postmasters names and service information Name of postmaster Military status Date of birth Date of appointment Date of vacancy Cause of vacancy A.G. Burridge (PM in 1964-01) Thos A.W. Gordon 1886-02-01 1888 * Thos A. Sproat 1889-02-01 1890 Transfer to Sprout Frank B. Wells 1890-05-01 1912-01-27 Dismissal, political partisanship F.H. Young 1912-04-01 1918 Death Capt T.E.L. Taylor 1919-04-01 1924-05-05 Resignation Walter Hardman OAS 1888-11 1924-08-19 *In compliance with the Privacy Act (1983), certain personal information has been deleted from this file. -
Ordering and viewing options You can order materials in advance to be ready for you when you visit. You will need a user card to do this.
Cannot visit us on site? You can purchase a copy to be sent to you. Some restrictions may apply.