Collection search - Sutton
-
Record information – Brief Sutton
Hierarchical level:ItemElectoral district:Brome - MissisquoiEstablished:Prior to 1841-07-06Province:QuebecReference:RG3-D-3Type of material:Textual materialFound in:Archives / Post Offices and PostmastersItem ID number:2717 -
Record information – Details Additional information:Government buildingLocation - Sutton - 1841PO 1323-1Semi staffStatus - Grade 5Source:PSFDS03-(28915)Postmasters names and service information Name of postmaster Military status Date of birth Date of appointment Date of vacancy Cause of vacancy Gilbert Frary 1841-07-06 Resignation Georges C. Dyer 1841-07-07 1890-06-09 Death Geo. H. Boright 1890-07-16 1897-03-13 * Chas. H. Griggs 1897-05-01 1911-12-28 Dismissal, political partisanship F. A. Olmstead 1912-01-20 1927-07-29 * Robert Hull OAS 1929-11-14 1930-09-30 Resignation Charles Edgar Curley 1882 1931-06-30 1936-02-17 Resignation Marcus H. OBrien 1865 1936-05-15 Acting Paul A. Morin 1894-09-16 1938-09-15 1944-06-30 Death Lyall Waite Longway 1887-08-11 1944-07-01 Acting Stanley-Ashton Whitford OAS * 1945-01-03 Acting Stanley Ashton Whitford OAS * 1947-07-21 1978-09-01 Retraite M. Lucien Lefebvre 1978-09-05 *In compliance with the Privacy Act (1983), certain personal information has been deleted from this file. -
Ordering and viewing options You can order materials in advance to be ready for you when you visit. You will need a user card to do this.
Cannot visit us on site? You can purchase a copy to be sent to you. Some restrictions may apply.