Collection search - Dawson
-
Record information – Brief Dawson
Hierarchical level:ItemElectoral district:YukonEstablished:1897-09-01Province:Yukon TerritoryReference:RG3-D-3Type of material:Textual materialFound in:Archives / Post Offices and PostmastersItem ID number:23071 -
Record information – Details Additional information:* Civil Service CommissionDowngraded to Semi-staff - 1958-12-16PO 2024-1PO 2085Semi-staff - 1898-09-20Staff - 1947-07-01Source:PSFDS03-(14751)Postmasters names and service information Name of postmaster Military status Date of birth Date of appointment Date of vacancy Cause of vacancy Frank Harper 1897-09-01 1898-10 RCMP relieved of PO Isaac J. Hartman 1898-11-01 1913-02-29 Resignation Alexander McCarter 1913-03-01 1931-05-15 Jame K. Johnstone 1931-10-01 1943-02-05 Ewart Charles Burt 1943-02-06 1949-09-13 Mr. T. Byers 1949-09-14 1954-04-16 D.A. Mackie 1954-04-17 Acting (Postal Clerk Gr. 2) D.A. Mackie 1956-05-11 1958-12-15 Stanley Harvey King (*) * 1958-12-16 Acting Stanley Harvey King * 1959-07-27 1960-08-31 Resignation Richard Arnold Berg * 1960-10-01 Acting Frank Sidstone (*) OAS * 1961-05-26 Acting Frank Sidstone OAS * 1962-05-31 *In compliance with the Privacy Act (1983), certain personal information has been deleted from this file. -
Ordering and viewing options You can order materials in advance to be ready for you when you visit. You will need a user card to do this.
Cannot visit us on site? You can purchase a copy to be sent to you. Some restrictions may apply.