Collection search - Madden
-
Record information – Brief Madden
Hierarchical level:ItemElectoral district:Bow River, West CalgaryEstablished:1906-10-01Province:AlbertaReference:RG3-D-3Type of material:Textual materialFound in:Archives / Post Offices and PostmastersItem ID number:22649 -
Record information – Details Additional information:Mail route - Crossfield-Sampsonton; Crossfield-MaddenMoney order business established - 1931-06-23No change in siteNW Sec. 31, Twp. 28, R. 2, W5M - 1929-12-31SE 1/4 Sec. 1, Twp. 29, R. 3, W5MSE Sec. 1, Twp. 29, R. 2, W5M (between 1929-12-31 and 1931-08-31)SE Sec. 1, Twp. 29, R. 3, W5M - 1927-06-10, 1928-03-31Sec. 1, Twp. 29, R. 3, W5M - 1906-10-01Sec. 31, Twp. 28, R. 2, W5MSW 1/4 Sec. 31, Twp. 28, R. 2, W5MSW Sec. 31, Twp. 28, R. 2, W5M - 1931-08-31Source:PSFDS03-(13663)Postmasters names and service information Name of postmaster Military status Date of birth Date of appointment Date of vacancy Cause of vacancy Arthur Sampson 1906-10-01 1908-12-29 Resignation Samuel Nicholson 1909-11-19 1913-03-03 Resignation C.J. Urquhart 1913-07-22 1914-03-09 Resignation E. Buschart 1914-05-06 1920-02-23 Resignation Guy H. Burke 1920-06-01 1927-03-15 Resignation George R. Pearson 1927-06-10 1928-03-30 Resignation William Tidball 1928-03-31 William Tidball 1928-08-18 1929-12-06 Resignation Albert Edward Tidball 1930-02-20 1932-03-15 Resignation Edred Edwin Tidball 1932-04-08 Edred Edwin Tidball OAS 1932-07-27 1933-03-01 Resignation Thomas Tidball OAS 1900-09-26 1933-05-23 1937-01-15 Resignation William Arden Tidball * 1937-02-16 William Arden Tidball * 1937-03-08 1947-10-31 Resignation James Hamilton OAS * 1947-11-16 Acting James Hamilton OAS * 1948-02-14 1949-09-19 Resignation Mrs. Estelle Dolena Dodd * 1949-10-01 Acting Lloyd Jasper Havens OAS 1896-04-23 1950-10-16 1954-10-29 Resignation Harold Percy Hardy * 1954-11-15 Acting Harold Percy Hardy * 1955-03-25 1971-07-28 Deceased Jane H. Hardy 1971-07-29 1972-09-19 (Acting PM) - Resigned Caroline J. Tetz 1972-09-20 1974-01-01 (Temporary PM) - Resigned Helen Stefanik * 1974-01-01 1976-09-05 Resigned Charles E. Rollins 1976-09-05 Temporary Charles E. Rollins 1976-10-25 *In compliance with the Privacy Act (1983), certain personal information has been deleted from this file. -
Ordering and viewing options You can order materials in advance to be ready for you when you visit. You will need a user card to do this.
Cannot visit us on site? You can purchase a copy to be sent to you. Some restrictions may apply.