Collection search - Buck Lake
-
Record information – Brief Buck Lake
Hierarchical level:ItemElectoral district:WetaskiwinEstablished:1910-11-01Province:AlbertaReference:RG3-D-3Type of material:Textual materialFound in:Archives / Post Offices and PostmastersItem ID number:21719 -
Record information – Details Additional information:60' W of West half of Sec. 11, Twp. 46, R. 6, W5M - 1955-08-20Dwelling - 1953-11-23NE 1/4 Sec. 10, Twp. 46, R. 6, W5MNE Sec. 10, Twp. 46, R. 6, W5M - 1952-02-01NE Sec. 10, Twp. 46, R. 6, W5M - 1952-09-21NW Sec. 11, Twp. 46, R. 6, W5M - 1938-06-22NW Sec. 11, Twp. 46, R. 6, W5M - 1953-11-23Sec. 15, Twp. 46, R. 6, W5MSec. 2, Twp. 46, R. 6, W5M - 1910-11-01Separate store owned by P.M. - 1952-02-01Store rented by P.M. - 1952-09-21SW 1/4 Sec. 10, Twp. 46, R. 6, W5MSource:PSFDS03-(12390)Postmasters names and service information Name of postmaster Military status Date of birth Date of appointment Date of vacancy Cause of vacancy J.L. Tipping 1910-11-01 1915-04-27 Resignation W. Sissons 1916-05-18 * Walter J. Sissons 1917-03-13 1919-06-12 Resignation E.J. Willson 1919-10-15 1920-01-20 Resignation Welbery Willson 1920-12-06 1924-09-04 Resignation E. Sabin 1924-12-08 1926-07-10 Resignation John Laughton Tipping 1926-12-01 1936-03-06 Death Robert John McNab * 1936-03-06 Acting Mrs. Alexandra Tipping 1865-02-28 1936-05-30 1936-10-08 Resignation Mrs. Elizabeth B. Byou 1901-05-26 1936-10-08 Acting Daniel Stuart Mitchell OAS 1900-11-06 1937-02-08 1942-05-18 Resignation Miss Hedrine Marie Kramer * 1942-05-23 Acting Alban Rixon Smith 1889-01-02 1942-09-01 1944-07-26 Resignation Charles Wm. Donald OAS 1892-03-13 1944-09-01 Acting Charles Wm. Donald OAS 1892-03-13 1944-11-14 1951-10-14 Resignation Edmund George Kluczny OAS * 1952-02-01 1952-09-04 Resignation Mrs. Audrey Rosella Levson * 1952-09-21 Acting Mrs. Audrey Rosella Levson * 1953-02-02 1955-08-02 Resignation George Dewey Woods OAS 1898-05-02 1955-08-20 Acting George Dewey Woods OAS 1898-05-02 1955-11-10 1963-05-02 Retirement Mrs. Ruby Woods * 1963-05-01 Acting Mrs. Ruby Woods * 1963-07-15 1967-12-11 Resignation Donald Theo Peterson * 1968-05-01 1969-05-05 Resignation Mrs. Madeleine Prefontaine * 1969-05-06 *In compliance with the Privacy Act (1983), certain personal information has been deleted from this file. -
Ordering and viewing options You can order materials in advance to be ready for you when you visit. You will need a user card to do this.
Cannot visit us on site? You can purchase a copy to be sent to you. Some restrictions may apply.