Collection search - Atikameg
-
Record information – Brief Atikameg
Hierarchical level:ItemElectoral district:Peace RiverEstablished:1927-03-01Province:AlbertaReference:RG3-D-3Type of material:Textual materialFound in:Archives / Post Offices and PostmastersItem ID number:21632 -
Record information – Details Additional information:Church propertyDistance to nearest offices - 45 miles to GrouardDistributing point - GrouardH.B. Company PostHudson's Bay Co. Post at Atikameg, Alberta on Sec. 8, Twp. 80, R. 11, W5MLot 4, Sec. 8 & 9, Twp. 80, R. 11, W5M - 1944-05-08Lots 4 & 5, Sec. 8 & 9, Twp. 80, R. 11, W5M - 1948-10-07, 1948-10-27Mail route - Atikameg-GrouardNE 1/4 Sec. 3, Twp. 80, R. 11, W5MNE Sec. 3, Twp. 80, R. 11, W5MRiver Lot, Sec. 2, Twp. 80, R. 11, W5M - 1927-03-01Sec. 8 & 9, Twp. 80, R. 11, W5M - 1948-10-08Store owned by Hudson's Bay Co.Store rents - 1942SW 1/4 Sec. 5, Twp. 80, R. 11, W5MSW Sec. 5, Twp. 80, R. 11, W5M - 1946-09-05SW Sec. 5, Twp. 80, R. 11, W5M, correction - 1931-03-11Source:PSFDS03-(12187)Postmasters names and service information Name of postmaster Military status Date of birth Date of appointment Date of vacancy Cause of vacancy Richard Routledge Smith OAS OAS 1918-12-26 1951-01-01 Acting Mrs. Fernande Hogue 1927-03-01 1930-07-26 Resignation Arthur Lewis Morden 1882-06-07 1930-11-06 1932-12-24 Resignation Ralph Morden (Granted military leave) * 1933-01-31 1948-07-15 Resignation Arthur Lewis Morden 1882-06-06 1942-07-17 Acting Robert Thompson Cathcart * 1944-05-08 Acting Re-transferred 1946-09-06 to Ralph Morden on discharge from Armed Forces Reverend Robert Thompson Cathcart * 1948-10-08 1948-10-27 Resignation William Willis * 1948-10-28 Acting Reverend George Skelton Johnston OAS * 1949-06-21 1950-07-26 Resignation Hugh Woodroffe Sutherland * 1950-07-27 Acting Hugh Woodroffe Sutherland * 1950-11-20 1950-11-24 Resignation Richard Routledge Smith OAS * 1951-02-15 1953-01-14 Resignation John Derek Riley OAS * 1953-02-23 Acting John Derek Riley OAS * 1953-06-12 1955-05-25 Resignation Mr. Norman Graham Simpson OAS * 1955-05-01 Acting Mr. Norman Graham Simpson OAS * 1955-08-02 1968-03-01 Change in PM only William Osborne 1968-03-01 *In compliance with the Privacy Act (1983), certain personal information has been deleted from this file. -
Ordering and viewing options You can order materials in advance to be ready for you when you visit. You will need a user card to do this.
Cannot visit us on site? You can purchase a copy to be sent to you. Some restrictions may apply.