Collection search - Anzac
-
Record information – Brief Anzac
Hierarchical level:ItemElectoral district:AthabaskaDate(s):Established Closing 1955-09-08 1966-03-01 Province:AlbertaReference:RG3-D-3Type of material:Textual materialFound in:Archives / Post Offices and PostmastersItem ID number:21567 -
Record information – Details Additional information:Mess hall - R.C.A.F. StationMile 261.5 Waterways Sub-division, North A.R.R. - 1955-09-08PO Rev. 2126Separate BuildingSource:PSFDS03-(12167)Postmasters names and service information Name of postmaster Military status Date of birth Date of appointment Date of vacancy Cause of vacancy George Harrison * 1955-09-08 1955-09-15 Resignation John Fullerton Craik OAS * 1955-09-21 Acting John Fullerton Craik OAS * 1955-10-17 1956-11-30 Resignation William Waugh Wright OAS 1895-07-17 1956-12-05 Acting William Waugh Wright OAS 1895-07-17 1957-01-17 1957-01-31 Resignation Gemmille George Farrah * 1957-02-01 Acting Joseph Lucien Robert Pelchat * 1957-03-31 Acting Joseph Lucien Robert Pelchat * 1957-05-10 1957-08-28 * Francis Patrick Quinn * 1957-08-01 Acting Francis Patrick Quinn * 1959-02-18 1960-06-15 Resignation Louis Souter * 1960-07-12 Acting Louis Souter * 1962-08-07 1964-03-01 Due to closing of RCAP Mountain Mrs. Marie Catherine Plews * 1964-03-02 1965-08-31 Resignation Mrs. Rosemarie Cecelia Pratt * 1965-09-16 Acting Harold Marshall Pratt * 1965-11-23 Acting Harold Marshall Pratt * 1966-02-02 1966-03-01 * Mrs. Ina Laverne Smith * 1966-06-01 1969-06-30 Resignation *In compliance with the Privacy Act (1983), certain personal information has been deleted from this file. -
Ordering and viewing options You can order materials in advance to be ready for you when you visit. You will need a user card to do this.
Cannot visit us on site? You can purchase a copy to be sent to you. Some restrictions may apply.