Collection search - Wolseley
-
Record information – Brief Wolseley
Hierarchical level:ItemElectoral district:Qu'AppelleEstablished:1882-10-01Province:SaskatchewanReference:RG3-D-3Type of material:Textual materialFound in:Archives / Post Offices and PostmastersItem ID number:21246 -
Record information – Details Additional information:PO 1840-1PrivateSec.11, Twp.17, R.10, W2 - 1882-10-01Semi-staffSource:PSFDS03-(12020)Postmasters names and service information Name of postmaster Military status Date of birth Date of appointment Date of vacancy Cause of vacancy W. McAllister 1882-10-01 1883 Resignation James P. Dill 1884-04-01 1889-03-25 Resignation Miss Nellie Dill 1889-07-01 1902-06-03 Resignation J. I. Mutrie 1902-08-01 1911-05-10 Resignation Alfred B. Bompas 1911-07-01 1919 Resignation Frank Vincent OAS 1885-02-13 1919-06-24 1950-05-13 Retirement Wilfred John Robertson * 1950-02-13 Acting Wilfred John Robertson * 1951-02-13 1981-03-31 Retirement Daniel E. Taylor 1981-04-27 *In compliance with the Privacy Act (1983), certain personal information has been deleted from this file. -
Ordering and viewing options You can order materials in advance to be ready for you when you visit. You will need a user card to do this.
Cannot visit us on site? You can purchase a copy to be sent to you. Some restrictions may apply.