Collection search - Woodville
-
Record information – Brief Woodville
Hierarchical level:ItemElectoral district:VictoriaEstablished:1853-11-01Province:OntarioReference:RG3-D-3Type of material:Textual materialFound in:Archives / Post Offices and PostmastersItem ID number:21031 -
Record information – Details Additional information:Civil Service CommissionEldonGovernment BuildingPO 2179-1Semi-staffSource:PSFDS03-(11738)Postmasters names and service information Name of postmaster Military status Date of birth Date of appointment Date of vacancy Cause of vacancy John Morrison 1853-11-01 1867-04-03 Resignation John C. Gilchrist 1867-06-01 1890 * Adam E. Stabach 1890-06-01 1927-01-18 Resignation Robert Edward Ernest Butler OAS 1897-10-28 1927-06-30 Granted Military Leave Mrs. Myrtle Alexander Butler 1897-09-25 1942-03-03 Acting Robert Edward Ernest Butler OAS 1897-10-28 1943-06-10 1961-04-06 Office re-transferred on dicharge from Army; Death Miss Myrle Noreen Campbell * 1961-04-07 Acting Elroy Hurley Butler OAS * 1961-12-05 Acting Elroy Hurley Butler OAS * 1962-12-06 *In compliance with the Privacy Act (1983), certain personal information has been deleted from this file. -
Ordering and viewing options You can order materials in advance to be ready for you when you visit. You will need a user card to do this.
Cannot visit us on site? You can purchase a copy to be sent to you. Some restrictions may apply.