Collection search - Quinton
-
Record information – Brief Quinton
Hierarchical level:ItemElectoral district:YorktonEstablished:1909-05-22Province:SaskatchewanReference:RG3-D-3Type of material:Textual materialFound in:Archives / Post Offices and PostmastersItem ID number:20953 -
Record information – Details Additional information:1/4 Sec.12, Twp.28, R.18, W2 - 1951-12-01Dwelling owned by Postmaster - 1952-08-01Lot 12, Blk.5 - 1952-08-01Lots 4 & 5, Blk.6Sec.12, Twp.28, R.18, W2 - 1909-05-22Separate Building - 1957-12-01Source:PSFDS03-(11877)Postmasters names and service information Name of postmaster Military status Date of birth Date of appointment Date of vacancy Cause of vacancy Fred W. Klein 1909-05-22 1909-11-15 Resignation Arnold Winder 1909-12-14 1910-03-13 Resignation C. Lange 1910-04-05 1910-10-01 Resignation S. Belans 1910-11-09 1913-09-03 Resignation J. Belans 1913-10-27 1914-01-17 Resignation W. A. Smiley 1914-02-13 1920-02-05 Resignation Joshua Guravich 1920-12-22 1924-04-28 Resignation Herman F. Seuberlich 1875-11 1924-08-05 1951-06-01 Resignation Herbert Wilyman OAS * 1951-12-01 1952-01-03 Resignation William Arthur Mason OAS 1896-01-25 1952-04-17 1962-11-06 Resignation Mrs. Dorothy Wilma Mason * 1962-12-01 Acting Mrs. Dorothy Wilma Mason * 1962-12-17 1970-06-16 Mrs. L. Lentes 1970-06-16 Temporary Mrs. Eleanor Schab 1970-08-17 *In compliance with the Privacy Act (1983), certain personal information has been deleted from this file. -
Ordering and viewing options You can order materials in advance to be ready for you when you visit. You will need a user card to do this.
Cannot visit us on site? You can purchase a copy to be sent to you. Some restrictions may apply.