Collection search - Torch River
-
Record information – Brief Torch River
Hierarchical level:ItemElectoral district:Prince AlbertDate(s):Established Closing 1928-10-01 1970-03-31 Province:SaskatchewanReference:RG3-D-3Type of material:Textual materialFound in:Archives / Post Offices and PostmastersItem ID number:20846 -
Record information – Details Additional information:Building set aside for use of officeNE 1/4 Sec.32, Twp.53, R.15, W2 - 1928-10-01NW 1/4 Sec.23, Twp.53, R.15, W2NW 1/4 Sec.34, Twp.53, R.15, W2Store rented by Postmaster - 1952-10-01SW 1/4 Sec.3, Twp.54, R.15, W2Source:PSFDS03-(11160)Postmasters names and service information Name of postmaster Military status Date of birth Date of appointment Date of vacancy Cause of vacancy Vacancy cancelled 1948-02-23 Resignation Mrs. Ethel Deller 1928-10-01 1929-05-31 Resignation Mrs. Eleanor Matice 1929-10-10 1932-08-05 Resignation Alfred Harvey Green 1898-06-01 1932-11-04 1938-01-19 Resignation Mrs. Frances Mary Matthew * 1938-03-15 1939-08-22 Resignation Albert Fryer OAS 1887-12-12 1939-10-04 1943-08-07 Resignation Mrs. Alice Cicelia Green * 1943-12-07 Acting Mrs. Alice Cicelia Green * 1944-04-28 1944-05-30 Resignation Alfred Robert Woods OAS 1887-08-13 1948-04-09 Acting Alfred Robert Woods OAS 1887-08-13 1948-07-30 1952-07-29 Resignation Mrs. Alice Cicelia Green * 1952-10-01 Acting Mrs. Alice Cicelia Green * 1952-10-09 1967-11-28 Resignation Lloyd Winston Kerr OAS * 1968-01-06 Acting Lloyd Winston Kerr OAS * 1968-02-15 1970-03-31 Closed *In compliance with the Privacy Act (1983), certain personal information has been deleted from this file. -
Ordering and viewing options You can order materials in advance to be ready for you when you visit. You will need a user card to do this.
Cannot visit us on site? You can purchase a copy to be sent to you. Some restrictions may apply.