Collection search - Manson Creek
-
Record information – Brief Manson Creek
Hierarchical level:ItemElectoral district:Cariboo, Prince George - Peace River, SkeenaDate(s):Established Closing 1899-05-01 Reopened Closing 1904-06-15 1937-06-03 Province:British ColumbiaReference:RG3-D-3Type of material:Textual materialFound in:Archives / Post Offices and PostmastersItem ID number:20094 -
Record information – Details Additional information:Location - Omineca Division, Lat. 55°, 40' - Long. 124°, 50'Office closed at end of 1900 summer season was not in operation in 1901, 1932-03-15 limited usefulnessStatus - Regular office in 1917Status - Summer office - 1899-05-01, 1904-06-15The Manson Creek Summer PO was not in operation during the years 1901 to 1903. The office was re-opened 1904-06-15 as a Summer Office. The status of the office was changed in 1917 to Regular POSource:PSFDS03-(22143)Summer-winter:1899-05-01 - 1899 Autumn1900 Summer - 1900 Autumn1904-06-15 - 19071905 Summer - 19081906 Summer - 1909 Autumn1907 Summer - 1910 Autumn1908 Summer - 1911 Autumn1909 Summer - 1912 Autumn1910 Summer - 1913 Autumn1911 Summer - 1914 Autumn1912 Summer - 1915 Autumn1913 Summer - 1916 Autumn1914 Summer1915 Summer1916 SummerPostmasters names and service information Name of postmaster Military status Date of birth Date of appointment Date of vacancy Cause of vacancy George S. Davison 1899-05-01 1900 At close of summer season F. W. Valleau (re-opened) 1904-06-15 1905 At close of summer season Ezra Evans 1906-07-01 1907-01-03 Resignation H. M. Beach 1907-07-01 1913-05-28 Non-residence of postmaster Allan Bate 1913-06-01 1916-12-31 * E. Sullivan 1917-03-01 1920-08-23 Resignation Archie King 1921-01-19 1925-02-19 Death William B. Steele 1925-06-25 1932-03-15 Office closed John Copeland (re-opened) 1937-06-03 1937-07-17 Resignation Roy Summers Cunningham 1937-07-17 Acting Ralph Parsons 1881-12-01 1937-12-15 1940-04-18 Resignation David Robertson OAS 1940-06-01 Acting David Robertson OAS 1896-03-23 1940-06-05 1949-06-16 Resignation Thomas Coatsworth Hamilton OAS 1886-05-21 1949-09-01 Acting Thomas Coatsworth Hamilton OAS 1886-05-21 1950-01-10 1963-08-28 Resignation Mrs. Carolyn Jean Marrs * 1963-08-16 Acting Mrs. Carolyn Jean Marrs * 1964-03-18 1966-09-04 Resignation Mrs. Margaret G. Owen * 1966-09-16 Acting Mrs. Margaret G. Owen * 1967-01-26 *In compliance with the Privacy Act (1983), certain personal information has been deleted from this file. -
Ordering and viewing options You can order materials in advance to be ready for you when you visit. You will need a user card to do this.
Cannot visit us on site? You can purchase a copy to be sent to you. Some restrictions may apply.