Collection search - Habay
-
Record information – Brief Habay
Hierarchical level:ItemElectoral district:Peace RiverDate(s):Established Closing 1951-11-20 1970-10-16 Province:AlbertaReference:RG3-D-3Type of material:Textual materialFound in:Archives / Post Offices and PostmastersItem ID number:19768 -
Record information – Details Additional information:East end of Hay Lake in North Western Alberta - 1951-11-20Store - 1951-11-20Store owned by H.B. Co. - 1953-03-04Source:PSFDS03-(13253)Postmasters names and service information Name of postmaster Military status Date of birth Date of appointment Date of vacancy Cause of vacancy Richard R. Smith OAS * 1951-11-20 1953-01-14 Resignation John Derek Riley OAS * 1953-03-04 Acting John Derek Riley OAS * 1953-07-02 1955-05-25 Resignation Norman Graham Simpson OAS * 1955-05-01 Acting Norman Graham Simpson OAS * 1955-07-26 1968-03-01 Change of PM only William Osborne 1968-03-01 1970-10-16 PO Temp. closed *In compliance with the Privacy Act (1983), certain personal information has been deleted from this file. -
Ordering and viewing options You can order materials in advance to be ready for you when you visit. You will need a user card to do this.
Cannot visit us on site? You can purchase a copy to be sent to you. Some restrictions may apply.