Collection search - Ste. Victoire
-
Record information – Brief Ste. Victoire
Hierarchical level:ItemElectoral district:Richelieu - VercheresEstablished:1853-07-01Province:QuebecReference:RG3-D-3Type of material:Textual materialFound in:Archives / Post Offices and PostmastersItem ID number:19705 -
Record information – Details Source:PSFDS03-(30022)Postmasters names and service information Name of postmaster Military status Date of birth Date of appointment Date of vacancy Cause of vacancy Henry P. Pare 1853-07-01 1860-05-01 Resignation Regis Latraverse 1860-05-30 1860-11-08 Resignation Dr Adolphe Bruneau 1861-01-01 1863-10-15 Resignation Pierre Dufault 1864-04-01 1865-04-15 Resignation Germain Brousseau 1865-10-01 1869-08-30 Resignation C.P. Cloutier 1869-10-01 1878-06-22 Resignation Hercule Paulhus 1875-07-01 1909 Death Miss Hermeline Paulhus 1909-10-12 1913-04-03 * Paul Bardier 1913-04-15 1917-09-07 Resignation Napoleon Counoyer 1918-04-19 1924-03-22 * Calbert St. Martin 1924-05-09 1932-09-01 Dismissal, political partisanship Aderard St. Martin 1882-06-29 1932-09-14 1938-10-11 * Roland St. Martin * 1938-11-16 1941-08-29 Granted military leave St. Martin Leduc * 1941-08-29 Acting Roland St. Martin 1946-05-01 1955-02-23 Resignation Mrs Yvette Tessier St. Martin 1955-04-16 Acting Mrs Yvette Tessier St. Martin 1955-04-28 1956-10-08 Resignation Mrs Andrea St. Martin Leduc 1956-11-16 1965-05-10 Death Jean Louis Leduc 1965-05-11 Acting Mrs Julienne Lavallee 1967-02-11 1979-06-16 Retraite Jean Louis Leduc 1968-08-27 1966-09-09 Resignation Mme P. Gagnon 1979-06-18 1982-06-11 Mme Morselle Lahaie * 1982-06-12 *In compliance with the Privacy Act (1983), certain personal information has been deleted from this file. -
Ordering and viewing options You can order materials in advance to be ready for you when you visit. You will need a user card to do this.
Cannot visit us on site? You can purchase a copy to be sent to you. Some restrictions may apply.