Collection search - Ilots-de Newport
-
Record information – Brief Ilots-de Newport
Hierarchical level:ItemElectoral district:GaspeDate(s):Established Closing 1871-09-01 1967-01-31 Province:QuebecReference:RG3-D-3Type of material:Textual materialFound in:Archives / Post Offices and PostmastersItem ID number:19682 -
Record information – Details Additional information:Location - Newport - 1871-09-01PO permanently closed to coincide with the establishment of the new service "Newport RR no. 1"Source:PSFDS03-(26915)Postmasters names and service information Name of postmaster Military status Date of birth Date of appointment Date of vacancy Cause of vacancy Clovis Desforges 1871-09-01 1885-09-05 Resignation Gregoire Grenier, Jr. 1886-01-01 1891-08-10 * Michael J. Ahern 1891-09-01 1897-04-20 * Joseph Cormier 1897-06-01 1912-02-13 Dismissal, political partisanship Jean B. Grenier 1912-02-20 1913-01-11 Change of site Ambroise Grenier 1913-01-20 1926-11-19 Dismissal, political partisanship Frank Sivrais 1926-11-30 1931-10-14 Dismissal, O. in C., political partisanship John Patrick Fahey 1931-11-04 1933-01-11 * Simon Sivrais 1933-01-31 1936-10-28 Dismissal, O. in C., political partisanship Lawrence Keighan 1937-07-19 1940-10-27 Death Miss Sarah Jane Keighan 1940-12-16 1948-11-15 Resignation Louis Syvrais OAS * 1949-01-16 Permanently closed *In compliance with the Privacy Act (1983), certain personal information has been deleted from this file. -
Ordering and viewing options You can order materials in advance to be ready for you when you visit. You will need a user card to do this.
Cannot visit us on site? You can purchase a copy to be sent to you. Some restrictions may apply.