Collection search - Eyre
-
Record information – Brief Eyre
Hierarchical level:ItemElectoral district:KindersleyDate(s):Established Closing 1914-08-01 1963-12-09 Province:SaskatchewanReference:RG3-D-3Type of material:Textual materialFound in:Archives / Post Offices and PostmastersItem ID number:19492 -
Record information – Details Additional information:SE 1/2 Sec.1, Twp.27, R.28, W3Sec.3, Twp.27, R.28, W3StoreSource:PSFDS03-(9716)Postmasters names and service information Name of postmaster Military status Date of birth Date of appointment Date of vacancy Cause of vacancy J. J. Daley 1914-08-01 1918-01-26 Resignation W. W. Reid 1918-06-15 1921-04-08 Resignation W. P. Lay 1921-06-25 1923-04-24 Resignation Ronald Edgar Bishop 1923-06-18 1924-04-07 Resignation G. H. Kidd 1924-09-01 1928-03-07 Resignation Ronald Edgar Bishop 1928-09-01 1937-07-24 Resignation James Clare May * 1938-01-15 Acting James Clare May * 1940-12-09 1941-10-31 Resignation William Thomas Hingston 1887-01-09 1941-11-18 Acting William Thomas Hingston 1887-01-09 1942-01-10 1951-04-24 Death Lloyd Henry Dalwood * 1951-05-03 Acting Bruce Moore Winter * 1951-08-01 Acting Bruce Moore Winter * 1952-01-30 1963-12-09 Closed *In compliance with the Privacy Act (1983), certain personal information has been deleted from this file. -
Ordering and viewing options You can order materials in advance to be ready for you when you visit. You will need a user card to do this.
Cannot visit us on site? You can purchase a copy to be sent to you. Some restrictions may apply.