Collection search - La Ronge
-
Record information – Brief La Ronge
Hierarchical level:ItemElectoral district:Prince AlbertEstablished:1911-06-01Province:SaskatchewanReference:RG3-D-3Type of material:Textual materialFound in:Archives / Post Offices and PostmastersItem ID number:19155 -
Record information – Details Additional information:Civil Service Commission - 1961-01-01Fur Trade Controller, Hudson's Bay Co.Hudson Bay Post, Indian Residential SchoolHudson Bay Post, Lot 13, Lac La Ronge SettlementPO 2271-1Semi-staffUnsurveyed - 1911-06-01Source:PSFDS03-(10275)Postmasters names and service information Name of postmaster Military status Date of birth Date of appointment Date of vacancy Cause of vacancy R. H. Hall 1911-06-01 1913-07-15 Resignation N. H. Bacon 1913-10-18 1921 Non-residence of Postmaster Angus Brabant 1921-05-17 1927-01 Retired from Hudson's Bay Co. Chas. Hunt French 1927-03-09 1931-01-03 Resignation Ralph Parsons 1881-12-01 1931-06-09 1940-04-18 Resignation David Robertson OAS 1896-03-23 1940-07-01 1944-09-25 Resignation Rev. George William Fisher 1887-06-25 1945-07-18 1946-07-17 Resignation Mrs. Agnes Hegland * 1946-08-30 Acting Mrs. Agnes Hegland * 1946-10-08 1967-07-13 Resignation Mrs. Hetty MacAuley 1967-08-22 Acting Robert John Rogers * 1967-11-16 1986-05-24 Retirement Darwin Chalupiak 1986-08-21 *In compliance with the Privacy Act (1983), certain personal information has been deleted from this file. -
Ordering and viewing options You can order materials in advance to be ready for you when you visit. You will need a user card to do this.
Cannot visit us on site? You can purchase a copy to be sent to you. Some restrictions may apply.