Collection search - Earl Grey
-
Record information – Brief Earl Grey
Hierarchical level:ItemElectoral district:Moose Jaw - Lake CentreEstablished:1905-10-16Province:SaskatchewanReference:RG3-D-3Type of material:Textual materialFound in:Archives / Post Offices and PostmastersItem ID number:18536 -
Record information – Details Additional information:* Re-transferred from Strasbourg StationCivil Service CommissionPO 2258-1S0G 1J0SE 1/4 Sec.10, Twp.23, R.20, W2Sec.10, Twp.23, R.20, W2 - 1905-10-16Semi-staff Grade 2Source:PSFDS03-(9621)Postmasters names and service information Name of postmaster Military status Date of birth Date of appointment Date of vacancy Cause of vacancy R. J. Wells 1905-10-16 1910-08-15 Resignation A. C. Beach 1910-09-08 1911-12-30 Dismissal, Political Partisanship F. C. Fowler 1912-01-24 1913-07-02 Resignation Dr. E. Rommell 1913-07-22 1915-10-25 Resignation P. A. Sharp 1915-11-30 1917-02-01 Resignation H. A. Walker 1917-03-09 1918-03-18 Amos Harrison 1918-05-11 1932-06-21 Resignation Thomas Charles Keep OAS 1932-08-15 1955-08-31 Temporary transfer to Strasbourg Station Mrs. Annie R. Peekless * 1955-08-31 Acting Thomas Charles Keep * OAS 1955-12-01 1956-08-15 Retirement Kenneth John Shaw OAS * 1956-08-16 Acting Kenneth John Shaw OAS * 1957-10-01 1967-05-31 Selected for Promotion Bruno Albert Cey * 1967-06-01 1970-06-30 John Moffat Griffiths 1970-07-01 1979-03-31 Retirement Mrs. Dorothy Heavisides 1979-03-31 Ron Fissel 1985-04-02 1987-05 Promotion Margaret Butz 1987-09-22 *In compliance with the Privacy Act (1983), certain personal information has been deleted from this file. -
Ordering and viewing options You can order materials in advance to be ready for you when you visit. You will need a user card to do this.
Cannot visit us on site? You can purchase a copy to be sent to you. Some restrictions may apply.