Collection search - Russell
-
Record information – Brief Russell
Hierarchical level:ItemElectoral district:MarquetteEstablished:1880-11-01Now known as:Shell River since 1889-03-01Province:ManitobaReference:RG3-D-3Type of material:Textual materialFound in:Archives / Post Offices and PostmastersItem ID number:18415 -
Record information – Details Additional information:Govt. BuildingGRP 06 1971-04-01GRP 06 1975-04-01GRP 06 1975-09-01GRP 06 1979-09-01P.O. 1634-1Sec. 22, Twp. 21, R. 28 - 1880-11-01Sec. 3, Twp. 21, R. 28, WPM - 1913-09-17Semi-StaffSource:PSFDS03-(8828)Postmasters names and service information Name of postmaster Military status Date of birth Date of appointment Date of vacancy Cause of vacancy William Denmark 1880-11-01 1885-04-03 Resignation John Brown 1885-07-01 1886-09-27 Resignation John G. Boulton 1887-01-01 1892-06-14 Resignation John Brown 1892-10-01 1897-05-01 Resignation A.G.P.Smellie 1897-08-01 1913-08-22 Resignation Percy H. Nelson OAS 1871-12-30 1913-09-17 1942-10-02 Death Mrs. Jean Voilet Nelson 1889-12-26 1942-10-03 Acting Henry Richard Dicketts OAS 1895-11-02 1944-10-06 1957-10-31 Retirement Miss G. Mary Bennett * 1957-11-01 Acting Thomas Edward O. Smart OAS * 1958-01-28 Acting Thomas Edward O. Smart OAS * 1959-02-01 1987-01-28 Retirement Agnes Klimack 1987-01-28 1987-04-02 Acting Ronald MacGranachan 1987-04-03 *In compliance with the Privacy Act (1983), certain personal information has been deleted from this file. -
Ordering and viewing options You can order materials in advance to be ready for you when you visit. You will need a user card to do this.
Cannot visit us on site? You can purchase a copy to be sent to you. Some restrictions may apply.