Collection search - Mille Vaches
-
Record information – Brief Mille Vaches
Hierarchical level:ItemElectoral district:SaguenayDate(s):Established Closing 1853-06-01 1866-07-01 Reopened Closing 1871-10-01 Now known as:St-Paul-du-Nord since 1931-06-01Province:QuebecReference:RG3-D-3Type of material:Textual materialFound in:Archives / Post Offices and PostmastersItem ID number:1738 -
Record information – Details Additional information:Location - Portneuf - 1953-06-01Source:PSFDS03-(27793)Postmasters names and service information Name of postmaster Military status Date of birth Date of appointment Date of vacancy Cause of vacancy John Peverley 1853-06-01 1863-08-12 Resignation John Peverley, Jr. 1865-04-01 1865-11-09 Resignation, closed Rev. Pierre Boily (re-opened) 1871-10-01 1874-03-31 Resignation Joseph A. Piuze 1874-09-01 1909-06 Change of site Elmeri Boullane 1909-06-18 1931-01-08 * Joseph Tremblay (Thaddee) 1931-01-26 *In compliance with the Privacy Act (1983), certain personal information has been deleted from this file. -
Ordering and viewing options You can order materials in advance to be ready for you when you visit. You will need a user card to do this.
Cannot visit us on site? You can purchase a copy to be sent to you. Some restrictions may apply.