Collection search - Vestfold
-
Record information – Brief Vestfold
Hierarchical level:ItemElectoral district:SelkirkDate(s):Established Closing 1895-06-01 1957-09-30 Province:ManitobaReference:RG3-D-3Type of material:Textual materialFound in:Archives / Post Offices and PostmastersItem ID number:17298 -
Record information – Details Additional information:Closed and mail routed to Inwood for disposal thereafterDwellingNE 1/4 Sec. 34, Twp. 18, R. 3, WPMSec. 36, Twp. 18, R. 3, W1 - 1895-06-01Source:PSFDS03-(8457)Postmasters names and service information Name of postmaster Military status Date of birth Date of appointment Date of vacancy Cause of vacancy Arni M. Freeman 1895-06-01 1921-05-25 Resignation Leonard H. Olsen OAS 1921-07-01 1926-03-13 Resignation Einar B. Johnson 1891-07 1927-01-04 1944-07-08 Closed temporarily John Olafur Olsen * 1945-10-19 1951-01-15 Resignation Bjorgvin Kristin Olsen * 1951-01-16 Acting Bjorgvin Kristin Olsen * 1951-03-02 1957-09-30 Resignation (Closed) *In compliance with the Privacy Act (1983), certain personal information has been deleted from this file. -
Ordering and viewing options You can order materials in advance to be ready for you when you visit. You will need a user card to do this.
Cannot visit us on site? You can purchase a copy to be sent to you. Some restrictions may apply.