Collection search - Robins
-
Record information – Brief Robins
Hierarchical level:ItemElectoral district:Inverness and RichmondDate(s):Established Closing 1884-08-01 1985-02-16 Province:Nova ScotiaReference:RG3-D-3Type of material:Textual materialFound in:Archives / Post Offices and PostmastersItem ID number:17144 -
Record information – Details Additional information:Distributing point - ArichatDwelling - 1949-12-12Location - 175 yards east - 1956-12-29Mail route - Arichat and RobinsStatus - Group 1 at time of closureSource:PSFDS03-(21247)Postmasters names and service information Name of postmaster Military status Date of birth Date of appointment Date of vacancy Cause of vacancy F. L. Malgard 1884-08-01 1885-06-15 Resignation Geo. LeBrun 1885-08-01 1892-03-21 Resignation Abraham DeGruchy 1892-05-02 1894-11-03 Resignation Phil. J. Fiott 1895-01-01 1901-12-11 Resignation Henry Duong 1859-01 1902-02-01 1949-11-29 Death Mrs. Mary Josephine Stone 1891-11-30 1949-12-12 Acting Mrs. Mary Josephine Stone 1891-11-30 1950-03-06 1956-08-18 Resignation Mrs. Marie Clotilda Power * 1956-12-30 Acting Mrs. Marie Clotilda Power * 1957-04-17 1958-03-14 Resignation, P.M.G. Cyril Henry Boudreau * 1958-06-29 Acting Cyril Henry Boudreau * 1959-02-06 P.M.G. (still 1973-06) *In compliance with the Privacy Act (1983), certain personal information has been deleted from this file. -
Ordering and viewing options You can order materials in advance to be ready for you when you visit. You will need a user card to do this.
Cannot visit us on site? You can purchase a copy to be sent to you. Some restrictions may apply.