Collection search - Guy Hill
-
Record information – Brief Guy Hill
Hierarchical level:ItemElectoral district:ChurchillDate(s):Established Closing 1949-04-16 1976-07-13 Province:ManitobaReference:RG3-D-3Type of material:Textual materialFound in:Archives / Post Offices and PostmastersItem ID number:17124 -
Record information – Details Additional information:HospitalNE 1/4 Sec. 34, Twp. 51, R. 25, WPMTemporarily closed 1972-05-12Source:PSFDS03-(8045)Postmasters names and service information Name of postmaster Military status Date of birth Date of appointment Date of vacancy Cause of vacancy Carlyle Christie Christiansen * 1949-04-16 1957-08-03 Resignation Allan Franklin Parker * 1957-09-01 Acting Allan Franklin Parker * 1959-02-04 1959-12-04 Resignation Archie Angus McDonald OAS * 1959-12-29 Acting Archie Angus McDonald OAS * 1960-03-30 1967-11-03 Resignation Mervin Leslie Somers * 1967-11-17 Acting Mervian Leslie Somers * 1968-01-11 1969-09-29 Retirement Mrs. Christina D. Baker * 1969-09-30 *In compliance with the Privacy Act (1983), certain personal information has been deleted from this file. -
Ordering and viewing options You can order materials in advance to be ready for you when you visit. You will need a user card to do this.
Cannot visit us on site? You can purchase a copy to be sent to you. Some restrictions may apply.