Collection search - St.-Agricole
-
Record information – Brief St.-Agricole
Hierarchical level:ItemElectoral district:TerrebonneEstablished:1894-09-01Now known as:Val-des-Lacs since 1968-02-01Province:QuebecReference:RG3-D-3Type of material:Textual materialFound in:Archives / Post Offices and PostmastersItem ID number:17012 -
Record information – Details Additional information:Location - ArchambaultSource:PSFDS03-(28975)Postmasters names and service information Name of postmaster Military status Date of birth Date of appointment Date of vacancy Cause of vacancy Irenee de Manteht 1894-09-01 1897-03-01 Resignation J. B. Desforges 1897-10-01 1898-04-27 I. De Mantell 1899-12-01 1905-03-21 Resignation Menasippe Piche 1905-05-01 1914-02-03 Chagne of site Mrs. Eva Brazeau Belair 1914-04-09 1918-10-16 Resignation Edouard Belair 1918-11-19 1922 Change in site Menasippe Piche 1922-09-21 1933-02-11 * Edouard Belair 1933-03-01 1942-09-01 Resignation L'Abbe Clement Boisvert 1942-11-17 Acting Mrs. Marie Louise Giguere D'Amour 1900-08-03 1943-10-23 Acting Mrs. Marie Louise Giguere D'Amour 1900-08-03 1943-10-25 1949-11-07 Resignation Victor Godon * 1949-12-01 Acting Victor Godon * 1949-12-30 *In compliance with the Privacy Act (1983), certain personal information has been deleted from this file. -
Ordering and viewing options You can order materials in advance to be ready for you when you visit. You will need a user card to do this.
Cannot visit us on site? You can purchase a copy to be sent to you. Some restrictions may apply.