Collection search - Riding Mountain
-
Record information – Brief Riding Mountain
Hierarchical level:ItemElectoral district:Portage - MarquetteEstablished:1892-11-01Province:ManitobaReference:RG3-D-3Type of material:Textual materialFound in:Archives / Post Offices and PostmastersItem ID number:16940 -
Record information – Details Additional information:GRP 03 1975-04-01GRP 03 1980-09-01GRP 04 1976-10-01GRP 07 1971-04-01GRP 11 1951-06-01GRP 11 1953-12-01GRP 11 1954-10-01GRP 12 1950-04-01GRP 12 1950-12-01GRP 13 1955-03-05GRP 13 1955-04-06GRP 13 1956-04-01GRP 13 1957-05-01GRP 13 1960-08-01GRP 13 1965-04-01GRP 13 1968-04-01Sec. 10, Twp. 18, R. 15, WPM - 1932-07-01Sec. 4, Twp. 18, R. 15, W1 - 1892-11-01StoreSource:PSFDS03-(8553)Postmasters names and service information Name of postmaster Military status Date of birth Date of appointment Date of vacancy Cause of vacancy A. H. Scouten 1892-11-01 1911-12-05 Dismissal (Political Partisanship) Harry Sucharoff 1912-01-01 1913-01-02 Resignation R. Campbell 1913-02-12 1918-03-16 Resignation Alfred Thurston 1880-04-13 1918-04-18 1944-06-06 Death Miss Muriel Isabella Buchanan * 1944-06-07 Acting Miss Muriel Isabella Buchanan * 1944-07-29 1945-06-29 * Calvin Joseph McLaughlin OAS * 1946-04-01 1950-03-22 Resignation Herbert Harly Howard 1894-04-13 1950-04-02 1951-05-03 Resignation Stephen Emery OAS 1891-08-13 1951-06-01 Acting Stephen Emery OAS 1891-08-13 1951-09-14 1955-01 Resignation Mrs. Agnus Ackerman * 1955-03-15 Acting Mrs. Agnus Ackerman * 1955-04-15 1977-11-12 Retired Mrs. Carole P. Dinsdale * 1977-11-12 1987-11-16 Resignation Cheryl Wilson 1987-11-16 1988-03-25 Converted to R.P.O. *In compliance with the Privacy Act (1983), certain personal information has been deleted from this file. -
Ordering and viewing options You can order materials in advance to be ready for you when you visit. You will need a user card to do this.
Cannot visit us on site? You can purchase a copy to be sent to you. Some restrictions may apply.