Collection search - Trois Rivières
-
Record information – Brief Trois Rivières
Hierarchical level:ItemElectoral district:Trois - RivieresEstablished:1765Province:QuebecReference:RG3-D-3Type of material:Textual materialFound in:Archives / Post Offices and PostmastersItem ID number:16813 -
Record information – Details Additional information:Government buildingGrade 2Location - St. Maurice, Trois-Rivieres - 1765Status - Staff officeSource:PSFDS03-(28593)Postmasters names and service information Name of postmaster Military status Date of birth Date of appointment Date of vacancy Cause of vacancy John Robertson (shown as PM in 1853) 1854-06-08 Resignation D. Chisholme (shown as PM in 1828) John Bignell (shown as PM in 1827) Hugh Finlay (shown as PM in 1765) Charles K. Ogden 1854-07-01 1902-01 Death William Chagnon 1902-05-20 1903-01-20 Death L. Gaspard Jourdain 1903-09-01 1932-07-15 Retired J. D. E. Toupin 1874-09-11 1934-06-01 1941-03-11 Retired Joseph Antonio Loyola Bernaquez 1941-03-11 1952-10-15 J. W. R. Clermont 1953-01-15 1955-03-29 J. E. Roger Cote 1955-03-30 1966-09-08 *In compliance with the Privacy Act (1983), certain personal information has been deleted from this file. -
Ordering and viewing options You can order materials in advance to be ready for you when you visit. You will need a user card to do this.
Cannot visit us on site? You can purchase a copy to be sent to you. Some restrictions may apply.