Collection search - Ville de Laval Sub no.40
-
Record information – Brief Ville de Laval Sub no.40
Hierarchical level:ItemElectoral district:Laval P.2Date(s):Established Closing 1938-09-06 1941-09-30 Reopened Closing 1946-07-25 1974-10-21 Province:QuebecReference:RG3-D-3Type of material:Textual materialFound in:Archives / Post Offices and PostmastersItem ID number:16583 -
Record information – Details Source:PSFDS03-(29178)Postmasters names and service information Name of postmaster Military status Date of birth Date of appointment Date of vacancy Cause of vacancy Lorzaro Lemmitti 1938-09-06 1940-10-31 Change of PM Fernand Lafontaine 1941-05-10 1941-09-30 Closing of office Miss Dolores Bognoni * 1946-07-25 1948-08-03 Resignation Jimmie Lammette 1900-09-18 1948-09-08 Acting Jimmie Lemmette 1900-09-18 1949-01-05 1949-07-23 Resignation Paul Descoteaux * 1949-08-30 Acting Paul Descoteaux * 1950-02-28 1952-09-02 * Jacques Sevigny * 1952-09-02 Acting Jacques Sevigny * 1953-01-06 1958-08-16 Resignation Jacques Theodule Menard * 1958-08-17 Acting Jacques Theodule Menard * 1959-05-14 C.S.C. *In compliance with the Privacy Act (1983), certain personal information has been deleted from this file. -
Ordering and viewing options You can order materials in advance to be ready for you when you visit. You will need a user card to do this.
Cannot visit us on site? You can purchase a copy to be sent to you. Some restrictions may apply.