Collection search - Harperville
-
Record information – Brief Harperville
Hierarchical level:ItemElectoral district:SelkirkDate(s):Established Closing 1891-10-01 1967-07-31 Province:ManitobaReference:RG3-D-3Type of material:Textual materialFound in:Archives / Post Offices and PostmastersItem ID number:16272 -
Record information – Details Additional information:Office permanently closed 1967-07-31 owing to the provision of Rural Mail Delivery service via Inwood R.R. No. 1 - Group 1Sec. 30, Twp. 16, R. 2, W1 - 1891-10-01Sec. 32, Twp. 16, R. 2, WPMSec. 33, Twp. 16, R. 2, WPMSource:PSFDS03-(7700)Postmasters names and service information Name of postmaster Military status Date of birth Date of appointment Date of vacancy Cause of vacancy Peter Harper 1891-10-01 1898-08-18 Resignation George Hector Harper 1899-01-01 1901-03-13 Resignation A.M. Miller 1903-01-01 1913-01-13 Death Mrs Ellen Miller 1913-04-01 1928-05-07 Change in site Otto Knutson Overby 1874-01-03 1929-01-25 1934-02-16 Resignation John Anderson OAS 1880-11-20 1934-04-01 1957-02-04 Death Ernest Overby * 1957-02-13 Acting Ernest Overby * 1957-04-18 1963-03-11 Resignation Mrs. Agatha Dyck * 1963-06-16 Acting Mrs. Agatha Dyck * 1963-07-03 1964-07-06 Resignation Mrs. Anna Overby * 1964-07-08 Acting John Crockatt OAS * 1964-09-19 *In compliance with the Privacy Act (1983), certain personal information has been deleted from this file. -
Ordering and viewing options You can order materials in advance to be ready for you when you visit. You will need a user card to do this.
Cannot visit us on site? You can purchase a copy to be sent to you. Some restrictions may apply.