Collection search - Cité-de-Jacques-Cartier Sub no.21
-
Record information – Brief Cité-de-Jacques-Cartier Sub no.21
Hierarchical level:ItemElectoral district:Richelieu - VercheresDate(s):Established Closing 1853-03-06 Reopened Closing Prior to 1832 1966-06-18 Province:QuebecReference:RG3-D-3Type of material:Textual materialFound in:Archives / Post Offices and PostmastersItem ID number:16052 -
Record information – Details Additional information:Location - 518 Blvd Marie Victorin - 3 de Grandpre - 1962-01-03Location - Boucherville - 1832Nature of premises - HousePost office permanently closed 1966-06-18 following the establishment of Boucherville P.O.Source:PSFDS03-(25906)Postmasters names and service information Name of postmaster Military status Date of birth Date of appointment Date of vacancy Cause of vacancy Aug Delisle (Shown PM in 1832) 1842-04-06 Louis Lacoste 1842-04-07 J.E. Trudel 1844 No records between 1844 and 1853 Pierre Monarque (reopened) 1853-03-06 1854-03 Resignation Ls Normandin 1854-04-01 1857-03-01 Resignation Jean B. Labelle 1859-06-01 1861-08-22 Resignation Louis Normandin 1862-04-01 1896-01-11 Resignation Jules C. Normandin 1896-02-01 1899 Death Dr L.R. Prevost 1899-04-01 1918 Death F.A. Bourdon 1864-08 1918-09-12 1949-08-24 Resignation Miss Agnes Bourdon 1891-06-03 1950-01-24 Acting Miss Agnes Bourdon 1891-06-03 1950-12-29 1957-06-02 Retirement Cyrille Huet 1895-06-09 1957-06-04 Acting Cyrille Huet 1895-06-09 1958-07-02 1966-06-18 Permanently closed *In compliance with the Privacy Act (1983), certain personal information has been deleted from this file. -
Ordering and viewing options You can order materials in advance to be ready for you when you visit. You will need a user card to do this.
Cannot visit us on site? You can purchase a copy to be sent to you. Some restrictions may apply.