Collection search - Cayer
-
Record information – Brief Cayer
Hierarchical level:ItemElectoral district:DauphinEstablished:1914-04-01Province:ManitobaReference:RG3-D-3Type of material:Textual materialFound in:Archives / Post Offices and PostmastersItem ID number:15956 -
Record information – Details Additional information:Accounting - 1968-06-12GRP 1 1973-10-01GRP 1 1978-04-01GRP 2 1969-10-01GRP 3 1955GRP 3 1956GRP 3 1957GRP 3 1960GRP 3 1965-10-01NE 1/4 Sec. 21, Twp. 26, R. 12, WPM - 1930-07-31NE Sec. 28, Twp. 26, R. 12, WPM - 1946-10-07NW Sec. 31, Twp. 26, R. 12, WPM - 1946-10-07SE 1/4 Sec. 28, Twp. 26, R. 12, WPM - 1936-10-15Source:PSFDS03-(7564)Postmasters names and service information Name of postmaster Military status Date of birth Date of appointment Date of vacancy Cause of vacancy Narcisse K. Cayer 1914-04-01 1930-06-04 Resignation Mrs. Mederise A. Filion 1898-07-13 1930-10-17 1936-06-26 * Mrs. Louise Christensen 1892-06-07 1936-10-15 1941-03-10 Resignation Mrs. Louise Finney * 1941-03-15 Acting Mrs. Louise Finney * 1941-06-20 1946-08-31 Resignation Mrs. Albina Neault * 1946-10-07 Acting Mrs. Albina Neault * 1946-11-16 1955-06-15 Death Miss Gloria Neault * 1955-07-02 Acting Miss Gloria Neault * 1955-08-23 1956-07-04 Resignation Herbert Earl Mailman * 1956-07-04 Acting Herbert Earl Mailman * 1956-10-16 1968-06-07 Resignation Mrs. Mary Eva Thibert * 1968-06-29 Acting Mrs. Mary Thibert * 1968-07-24 1983-10-28 Retirement Darlene May Thibert 1983-10-28 *In compliance with the Privacy Act (1983), certain personal information has been deleted from this file. -
Ordering and viewing options You can order materials in advance to be ready for you when you visit. You will need a user card to do this.
Cannot visit us on site? You can purchase a copy to be sent to you. Some restrictions may apply.